+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
- Read first time
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 19, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/29/2021
On March 15, 2021 in the House:
- Withdrawn from schedule
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/15/2021
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
- Read first time
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor