+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (78)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- House adopts resolution for tech. correction
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- House adopts conference committee report
- House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
On May 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate appoints conferees
- Senate grants request for conference comm.
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- House appoints conferees-reported
- House requests conference committee-reported
- House refuses to concur-reported
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- House requests conference committee
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Three day rule suspended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on intent calendar
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed as amended
- Amended
- Reported engrossed
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
- Read first time
- Referred to Government Organization
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 5, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Transparency in State Agency Operations, Select
- Read first time
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Filed