+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Business & Industry
- Read first time
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (60)
Type:
Primary Sponsor