+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (64)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective on 9/1/13
- Signed by the Governor
On May 26, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Motion to suspend three day rule fails
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Read 2nd time
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken in committee
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 21, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Filed