+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (81)
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/19
- Signed by the Governor
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 27, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Reported enrolled
On May 26, 2019 in the House:
- House adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
- Reason for vote recorded in Journal
On May 26, 2019 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 25, 2019 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
- House requests conference committee
- House appoints conferees
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- House refuses to concur-reported
- House appoints conferees-reported
- House requests conference committee-reported
- Senate appoints conferees
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate grants request for conference comm.
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Passed
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 5/13/2019
- Testimony taken in committee
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Passed as amended
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Major State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Point of order sustained (amendment)
- Amendment(s) offered
- Point of order sustained (amendment)
- Amended
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on3/6/2019
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
- Read first time
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (45)
Type:
Primary Sponsor