+ − Actions (15)
On April 20, 2009 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 17, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 9, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor