+ − Actions (61)
On May 31, 2009 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
On May 30, 2009 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
On May 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 30, 2009 in the House:
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
- Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate appoints conferees
- Senate grants request for conference comm.
On May 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- House appoints conferees-reported
- House requests conference committee-reported
- House refuses to concur-reported
On May 23, 2009 in the House:
- House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
- House requests conference committee
- House appoints conferees
On May 22, 2009 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments printed and distributed
On May 21, 2009 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Laid before the Senate
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On May 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On April 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 3, 2009 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On April 2, 2009 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Laid out as postponed business
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On March 26, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On March 23, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 18, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- Filed