+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 21, 2011 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider spread on the Journal
- Record vote
- Failed to pass
- Amended
- Read 3rd time
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Amended
- Laid out as postponed business
- Amended
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Amended
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 1, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Considered in public hearing
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On November 8, 2010 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor