+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/20/2021
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor