+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (57)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective immediately
On May 27, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-sponsor authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Vote recorded in Journal
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken in committee
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in Calendars
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
- Read first time
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Filed