+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (61)
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/17
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On May 21, 2017 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 20, 2017 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
- Record vote
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Read 3rd time
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to 3rd reading as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Senate passage as amended reported
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Business & Industry
- Read first time
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor