+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in Calendars
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Transferred to Calendars Committee
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Special Purpose Districts
- Read first time
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Filed