+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in Calendars
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Environmental Regulation
- Correction in referral
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Natural Resources
- Read first time
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor