+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Transferred to Calendars Committee
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
- Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
- Withdrawn from calendar
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
- Read first time
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor