+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken in committee
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
- Received from the House
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
- Passed
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Elections
- Read first time
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor