+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (54)
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective immediately
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the Senate
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 25, 2015 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on intent calendar
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On May 9, 2015 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Recalled from subcommittee
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
- Committee substitute considered in s/c
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Read first time
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor