+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Companion considered in lieu of
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On March 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services
- Read first time
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor