+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to committee
- Point of order sustained
- Placed on General State Calendar
- Placed on Major State Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Point of order overruled (amendment)
- Amendment to amendment tabled
- Record vote
- Amendment to amendment tabled
- Record vote
- Point of order overruled
- Point of order overruled (amendment)
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Vote reconsidered in committee
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Considered in Calendars
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recalled from subcommittee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
- No action taken in committee
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in subcommittee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
- Committee substitute considered in s/c
- Considered by s/c in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Read first time
On January 10, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor