+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
- Recommitted to committee
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Filed