+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor