+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Companion considered in lieu of
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
- Read first time
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor