+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Human Services
- Read first time
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Filed