+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report distributed
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Amendment(s) considered in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Left pending in committee
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Correction in referral
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor