+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 4, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on5/1/2019
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor