+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Posting rule suspended
On May 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On April 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 25, 2011 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
On April 21, 2011 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On April 18, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 8, 2011 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Higher Education
- Read first time
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor