+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on4/23/2019
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
- Read first time
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Filed