+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (47)
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Effective on 9/1/17
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 28, 2017 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 27, 2017 in the House:
- Reported enrolled
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Senate passage reported
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Not again placed on intent calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Record vote
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Passed to engrossment
- Read 2nd time
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Corrections
- Read first time
On November 14, 2016 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor