+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor