+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table subject to call
- Companion considered in lieu of
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
- Read first time
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor