+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Transferred to Calendars Committee
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Public Education
- Read first time
On November 12, 2012 in the House:
- Filed