+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (40)
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
On May 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Posting rule suspended
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Reported engrossed
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Amended
- Laid out as postponed business
- Point of order overruled
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Postponed
- Laid out as postponed business
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Postponed
- Read 2nd time
On May 6, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Urban Affairs
- Read first time
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Filed