+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (70)
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Effective immediately
- Signed by the Governor
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
- Subject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution
- Text of Senate Amendment(s)
- Record vote
- Reported enrolled
- Signed in the House
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in Senate-Art III Sec 49a Tx. Const.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Comptroller
- Sent to the Governor
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
- Senate Amendments distributed
- Senate passage as amended reported
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment withdrawn
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Read 3rd time
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Passed
- Record vote
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House
- Read first time
- Referred to Finance
- Posting rule suspended
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment withdrawn
- Placed on Major State Calendar
- 1 hr. notice-to suspend rules
- Rules suspended
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Placed on Emergency Calendar
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Constitutional three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Subject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Calendars Committee rule adopted
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Reason for vote recorded in Journal
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
- Vote reconsidered in committee
- Considered in Calendars
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations
- Read first time
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Filed
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor