+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 2-27-20
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Adopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 2/24/2020
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
February 27, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 93
February 24, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 30
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor