+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 2/23/17
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 2/16/2017
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
February 23, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
February 16, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 33
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor