+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 1
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for for 4-23-18
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 29, Nays 0
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 4/19/2018
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
April 23, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94
April 19, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 29
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor