+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Failed in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/31/2015
- Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. Commerce & Labor Comm. Cal.. 3/31/15
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee Ayes 6, Nays 2 PNV 1
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/25/2015
- Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. H&W Comm. Cal. 3/25/15
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 31, 2015: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
March 31, 2015: SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
March 25, 2015: SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee Ayes 6, Nays 2 PNV 1
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
March 25, 2015: SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee Ayes 6, Nays 2 PNV 1
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1