+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On November 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On October 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On October 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 10/29/2021
On October 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On October 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
October 29, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 31
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor