+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Adopted, Ayes 28, Nays 0
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/3/2020
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 1/30/2020
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 1/29/2020
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
February 3, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 9
January 29, 2020: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 9