+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On April 20, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. 2 for 4-17-18
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
- Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 4/16/2018
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
April 17, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 94
April 16, 2018: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 32
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor