+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 1
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 2/20/20
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 2/13/2020
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
February 20, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 1
February 13, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 31
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor