+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Gov. for action.
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 96, Nays 0
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 2/21/2013
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec. for adoption, by S. E,A&NR Comm., ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. E,A&NR Comm. cal. for 2/13/2013
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. E,A&NR Comm.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (4)
November 6, 2014: S. ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES
- Yeas: 8
February 25, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONCUR
- Yeas: 96
February 21, 2013: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 31
February 13, 2013: S. E,A&NR COMM.
- Yeas: 8