+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Adopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 5/4/2017
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
May 4, 2017: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 30
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor