+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/20/2014
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rec. for adoption by S. Comm. ref to: S. Cal. Comm.
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/17/2014
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (2)
March 20, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
March 17, 2014: S. ED. COMM.
- Yeas: 7