+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Rules Suspended, Adopted, Ayes 29, Nays 0
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
+ − Votes (2)
January 23, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 29
April 19, 2016: FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 96
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor