+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 1
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. #2 for 5/5/21
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 5/5/2021
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
May 5, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 88
- Present/NV: 1
May 5, 2021: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 31
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor