+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV1
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Adopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/10/2020
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/5/2020
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (3)
February 20, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 1
February 10, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 8
February 5, 2020: SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Johnson
Type:
Primary Sponsor