+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
- Concurred, Ayes 86, Nays 0, PNV 3
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 1-30-20
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 1/29/2020
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
January 30, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 86
- Present/NV: 3
January 29, 2020: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 31
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor