+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by S. Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 2/10/2014
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- P2C, ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Vote
February 10, 2014: FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT
- Yeas: 32
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor