+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On September 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On September 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor for action.
On September 3, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On August 23, 2019 in the House:
- Concurred, Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0
- SJR placed on H. consent cal. 3 for 8/23/19
On August 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
- Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
- Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 8/23/2019
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On August 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (2)
August 23, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR 3 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 97
August 23, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 32
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor