+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
- Enrolled and ready for signatures
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Adopted, Ayes 29, Nays 0
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/4/2019
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, Passed on First Consideration
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
+ − Vote
February 4, 2019: FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt
- Yeas: 29
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor